SC S0581 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designate The Third Week In April 2013 As "shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week" To Raise Awareness Regarding Shaken Baby Syndrome And To Commend The Hospitals, Child Care Councils, Schools, And Other Organizations That Educate Parents And Caregivers On How To Protect Children From Abuse.
Title
Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
S0603 (Similar To) 2013-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs