SC S0628 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "pharmacy Access Act", By Adding Sections 40-43-210, 40-43-230, 40-43-240, 40-43-250, 40-43-260, And 40-43-270 So As To Allow Pharmacies To Administer And Dispense Certain Hormonal Contraception To Patients Pursuant To A Standing Order And In Accordance With A Written Joint Protocol Issued By The Board Of Medical Examiners And Board Of Pharmacy, To Be Issued Within Six Months Of The Effective Date Of The Act; To Set Forth Certain Requirements For The Written Joint Protocol; To Require Pharmacists To Obtain A Screening Self-assessment From A Patient Before Administering Or Dispensing Hormonal Contraception; To Provide Certain Limitations From Liability And Professional Discipline For Prescribers And Pharmacists; To Define Terms; And For Other Purposes; By Adding Section 44-6-115 So As To Require The Medicaid Program To Cover Pharmaceutical Services That Include Access To Hormonal Contraception; And By Adding Section 40-43-195 So As To Provide For The Permitting Of Central Fill Pharmacies To Fill Prescription Drug Orders At The Request Of An Originating Pharmacy; To Define Terms; To Establish Certain Requirements Regarding The Use And Operation Of Central Fill Pharmacies; To Require Certain Record Keeping; And For Other Purposes. - Ratified Title
Title
Pharmacy Access Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 1 N: 102 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-58b (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment #5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 74 N: 29 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 1 N: 102 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-58b (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment #5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 74 N: 29 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Act No. 210 | |
2022-06-01 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2022-05-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Ratified R 238 | |
2022-05-12 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-12 |
2022-05-12 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-05-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Jordan, Ott, Lowe |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Davis, Cromer, Hutto |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-1 Nays-102 |
2022-05-12 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2022-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-74 Nays-29 |
2022-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-04 | House | Amended |
2022-05-04 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2022-05-03 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-04-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-08 | Amended | |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0151 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
H3175 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
H3175 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 43 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 6 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |