SC S0777 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Archives And History, Relating To Rehabilitation Of Designated Historic Buildings, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4135, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Rehabilitation of designated historic buildings (D. No.4135)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-13 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-04-07 | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time | |
2011-04-06 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
H3786 (Similar To) 2011-03-22 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary