SC S0798 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-117-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The University Of South Carolina Board Of Trustees, So As To Reduce The Size Of The Board And The Areas From Which Elected Members Are Selected; To Amend Section 59-117-20, Relating To Terms Of Elected Members Of The Board, So As To Provide For The Election Of New Members Of The Board For Staggered Terms Beginning July 1, 2020; To Amend Section 57-117-40, Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Board, So As To Revise Certain Powers; And To Amend Section 59-117-50, Relating To Meetings Of The Board, So As To Further Provide For How Special Meetings Of The Board May Be Called.
Title
USC Board of Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0878 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4752 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
H4752 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 117 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |