SC H4752 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-117-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The University Of South Carolina Board Of Trustees, So As To Revise The Composition Of The Board; To Amend Section 59-117-20, Relating To Terms Of Elected Members Of The Board, So As To Provide For The Election Of New Members Of The Board For Staggered Terms Beginning July 1, 2021; To Amend Section 59-117-40, Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Board, So As To Provide The Board Shall Elect A Chairman, To Provide The Chairman Serves A Two Year-term, And To Provide A Trustee May Not Serve More Than Two Terms As Chairman; And To Amend Section 59-117-50, Relating To Meetings Of The Board, So As To Provide For How Special Meetings Of The Board May Be Called.
Title
USC Board of Trustees; revise certain powers
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] | Rep. Todd Rutherford [D] | Rep. Murrell Smith [R] |
Rep. Kirkman Finlay [R] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0798 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0878 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0878 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 117 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4752&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4752_20191211.htm |