SC S0812 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow A Bingo Volunteer To Participate In Bingo Games Under Certain Circumstances
Title
Raffles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 192 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 05/15/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 210 | |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-16 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-24 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 21 | 3925 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |