SC S0841 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Enacting The "prosecutors Personal Privacy Protection Act" By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 2, Title 30 So As To Define Necessary Terms, And To Provide Current And Former Prosecutors Have The Option Of Making Personal Contact Information Held By State Or Local Governments Confidential And Not Subject To Disclosure, To Provide Limited Exceptions, And To Provide Related Procedures For Exercising This Option, Among Other Things; And To Provide The South Carolina Commission On Prosecution Coordination Shall Create A Form For Use By Prosecutors When Requesting Nondisclosure Of Personal Contact Information, And To Specify Requirements For The Form.
Title
Prosecutors Personal Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-05-07 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-05-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Reichenbach, Devine |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4576 (Similar To) 2024-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary