SC S1120 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3795, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The South Carolina Housing Tax Credit, So As To Define Terms And Limit The Credit; To Amend Article 3 Of Chapter 11, Title 1, Relating To The Allocation Of State Ceiling On Issuance Of Private Activity Bonds, So As To Require The State Fiscal Accountability Authority To Develop A State Ceiling Allocation Plan Annually, To Specify Requirements Of The Plan, And To Provide A Process For Periodic Allocations Of The State Ceiling; And To Repeal Section 1-11-370 Relating To Indebtedness Included Within Any Limits On Private Activity Bonds.
Title
Housing tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-xxx Nays-xxx |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H5075 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Act No. 202