SD HB1014 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the criteria for designation as a regional nursing facility and applicable reimbursement.
Title
Amend the criteria for designation as a regional nursing facility and applicable reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1014A |
2024-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 18 |