SD HB1017 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Bureau of Administration to construct a maintenance shop in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Bureau of Administration to construct a maintenance shop in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 661 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by President S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 539 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 510 | |
2012-02-21 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 480 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 298 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 17. H.J. 321 | |
2012-02-02 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 293 | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 18 |