SD HB1017 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain outdated and unnecessary statutes related to the Department of Social Services.
Title
Repeal certain outdated and unnecessary statutes related to the Department of Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 346 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 302 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 213 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 254 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 174 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 142 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 87 |
2014-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 48 |
2014-01-16 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-16 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 42 |
2014-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 19 |