SD HB1017 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Corrections to purchase certain real property, to contract for the design of a prison facility for offenders committed to the Department of Corrections, to make an appropriation therefor, to transfer funds to the incarceration construction fund, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Department of Corrections to purchase certain real property, to contract for the design of a prison facility for offenders committed to the Department of Corrections, to make an appropriation therefor, to transfer funds to the incarceration construction fund, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544 |
2023-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 497 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 430 |
2023-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 467 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 391 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 368 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 387 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 387 Amendment 1017A |
2023-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 374 |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. J.J. 7 |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 24 |
2023-01-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 14 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Corrections
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Transfer of Funds
Corrections
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Transfer of Funds