SD HB1042 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the penalty for late payment of the additional original registration tax on aircraft.
Title
Revise the penalty for late payment of the additional original registration tax on aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 676 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 620 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 501 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 585 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 454 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 421 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 114 |
2014-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 86 |
2014-01-21 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 56 |
2014-01-21 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1042ob |
2014-01-21 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1042oa |
2014-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 24 |