SD HB1239 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the dissemination of incorrect or misleading ballot information and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Prohibit the dissemination of incorrect or misleading ballot information and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Rep. Bethany Soye [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Randy Gross [R] |
Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Ben Krohmer [R] | Rep. Karla Lems [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Rep. Scott Odenbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 328 |
2024-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 8. H.J. 321 |
2024-02-08 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 5 |
2024-02-08 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed H.J. 5 Amendment 1239D |
2024-02-08 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 4 Amendment 1239A |
2024-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 213 |