SD SB114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designate the American bison as the state mascot.
Title
Designate the American bison as the state mascot.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] | Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Thomas Nelson [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 598 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 337 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 283 Amendment 114xta | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 282 | |
2012-02-01 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 114jta | |
2012-02-01 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 242 | |
2012-02-01 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 114ja | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 130 |