SD SB193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize counties to issue additional on-sale licenses for certain facilities located on hunting preserves.
Title
Authorize counties to issue additional on-sale licenses for certain facilities located on hunting preserves.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Abdallah [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] |
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Kent Juhnke [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Rep. Steve Street [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 682 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 663 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 10. H.J. 645 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 594 | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 448 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 453 | |
2011-02-14 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 410 | |
2011-02-14 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 193fb | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 246 |