SD SB43 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain health insurance standards for patient protection.
Title
Revise certain health insurance standards for patient protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 16. H.J. 583 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 562 | |
2011-02-25 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 529 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 320 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 341 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 340 Amendment 43jb | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 322 | |
2011-02-01 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 273 | |
2011-02-01 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 43ja | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-27 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-20 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 23 |