TN HB0009 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an offense for a person who engages in an adult cabaret performance on public property or in a location where the adult cabaret performance could be viewed by a person who is not an adult. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 14.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 14, relative to adult-oriented performances.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Kevin Raper [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Scotty Campbell [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2 | |
2023-02-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/16/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/7/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/31/2023 |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-12-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0003 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Effective date(s) 04/01/2023