TN HB1632 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, gives a parent of a child who attends, or who is eligible to attend, a school operated by a local education agency or a public charter school standing to file a civil action against the LEA or public charter school in a chancery court of competent jurisdiction to enforce the Age-Appropriate Materials Act of 2022. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 38, relative to the Age-Appropriate Materials Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1858 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.