TN HB1947 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to criminal offenses involving fentanyl; increases the penalty one classification for criminal offenses involving fentanyl if the defendant crossed county lines in the course of the criminal offense; requires certain drug offenses to be punished as second degree murder if the substance involved is a Schedule I or II controlled substance and the offense resulted in the death of another person; creates a new criminal offense of aggravated assault on a first responder by exposing the first responder to fentanyl. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to controlled substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1754 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024