TN HB1960 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a voucher program for students assigned to or enrolled in schools in the achievement school district. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, establishes a voucher program for students assigned to or enrolled in schools in the achievement school district. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1960&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1960.pdf |