TN HB1960 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Juvenile Justice Realignment Act"; creates a task force to study new approaches to the administration of juvenile justice. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 37.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Juvenile Justice Realignment Act"; creates a task force to study new approaches to the administration of juvenile justice. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 37.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] |
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057 | |
2016-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Civil Justice--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2586 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1057
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1960&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1960.pdf |