TN HB2372 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a person applying for expunction of criminal records to pay the appropriate court clerk’s fee, in addition to any other fees required unless the person is entitled to have such records removed and destroyed without cost. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, requires a person applying for expunction of criminal records to pay the appropriate court clerk’s fee, in addition to any other fees required unless the person is entitled to have such records removed and destroyed without cost. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-02 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2504 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1008