TN HB2539 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, urges the department of health along with the department of agriculture to study the effects of the sale and distribution of vapor products to persons under 21 and make recommendations to the legislature with regard to reducing such sale and distribution. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15, relative to vapor products.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2397 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee