TN SB2397 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, urges the department of health along with the department of agriculture to study the effects of the sale and distribution of vapor products to persons under 21 and make recommendations to the legislature with regard to reducing such sale and distribution. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15, relative to vapor products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2539 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee