TN HB2785 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the limitation that only the chancery court of Davidson County is authorized to review a contested case hearing where a declaratory order is issued. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, removes the limitation that only the chancery court of Davidson County is authorized to review a contested case hearing where a declaratory order is issued. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0894) |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2593 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee