TN HB2785 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits paid lobbyists from serving as members of state and local boards, commissions, and other governmental entities. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6; Title 4 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 6; Title 4 and Title 8, relative to lobbyists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2838 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee