TN HB2959 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits reasonable costs assessed by a records custodian from including labor charges; deletes the requirement of an additional charge for frequent and multiple requests. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Section 10-7-503.
Title
As introduced, prohibits reasonable costs assessed by a records custodian from including labor charges; deletes the requirement of an additional charge for frequent and multiple requests. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Section 10-7-503.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2619 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2959&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2959.pdf |