TN HB3065 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Failed In s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Failed In s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the spending of public funds on the support or opposition of any referendum. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the spending of public funds on the support or opposition of any referendum. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Failed In s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c Elections of S&LG to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in s/c Elections of S&LG to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in s/c Elections of S&LG to 3/16/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3762 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3065&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3065.pdf |