TN SB0799 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1070
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1070
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts compressed natural gas from sales tax in the same manner that the present law exempts motor fuel and liquified gas from sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, exempts compressed natural gas from sales tax in the same manner that the present law exempts motor fuel and liquified gas from sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1070 | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend, as amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means to next calendar |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Rev. Sub. of FW&M Comm. Cal. 3/31/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0879 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1070