TN SB1603 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 948
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 948
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2013. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2013. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 948 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/19/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1673 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948