TN SB1790 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that all written, printed, or computer-generated orders for a Schedule II controlled substance prepared by a podiatrist, dentist, physician, surgeon, optometrist, osteopathic physician, advanced practice nurse, or physician assistant be written legibly, printed, or computer-generated as a separate prescription order; requires on handwritten prescriptions that quantity be written in letters or numbers instead of both letters and numbers. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
As enacted, requires that all written, printed, or computer-generated orders for a Schedule II controlled substance prepared by a podiatrist, dentist, physician, surgeon, optometrist, osteopathic physician, advanced practice nurse, or physician assistant be written legibly, printed, or computer-generated as a separate prescription order; requires on handwritten prescriptions that quantity be written in letters or numbers instead of both letters and numbers. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 795 | |
2010-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/19/10; 01/01/11 | |
2010-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-07 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-04-05 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-05 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1077) | |
2010-04-05 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-03-25 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-03-24 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-24 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-24 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0980) | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-15 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0568 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 795