TN SB2265 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes and additions to present law concerning consumption of alcoholic beverages on premises; authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at certain premier type tourists resorts. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-202 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes and additions to present law concerning consumption of alcoholic beverages on premises; authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at certain premier type tourists resorts. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-202 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 1001 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/22/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S. concurred in H. am. 2 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 15, PNV 6 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1016) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1207) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 20, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1032) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2240 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1001