TN SB2347 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E&E Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E&E Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates fish hatcheries fund whereby all revenue collected from the sale of trout stamps will be used exclusively to operate and maintain fish hatcheries in Tennessee; in 2011, the cost of a trout stamp was $18.00. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, creates fish hatcheries fund whereby all revenue collected from the sale of trout stamps will be used exclusively to operate and maintain fish hatcheries in Tennessee; in 2011, the cost of a trout stamp was $18.00. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-25 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E&E Comm. | |
2012-03-21 | Action Def. in S. E&E Comm. to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. E&E Comm. cal. for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. E&E Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2436 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-28 - Action Def. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee to commission study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2347&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2347.pdf |