TN SB2465 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends alcoholic beverage commission, June 30, 2010; revised provisions regarding membership of commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 57.
Title
As enacted, extends alcoholic beverage commission, June 30, 2010; revised provisions regarding membership of commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 57.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 4 BY Watson (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 4 BY Watson (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1118 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/29/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-09 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 86, Nays 3 | |
2010-06-09 | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 6/09/10 | |
2010-06-09 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (3) cal. for 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Conf. comm. appointed. (Lynn, M. Turner, Todd) | |
2010-05-24 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-24 | Reset on next available message cal. | |
2010-05-24 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/24/10 | |
2010-05-24 | S. Conf. comm. appointed. (Johnson, Watson, Barnes) | |
2010-05-24 | S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence on am. 1 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (2) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-20 | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 | |
2010-05-17 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/20/10 | |
2010-05-17 | Reset on Message cal. for 5/20/10 | |
2010-05-12 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/17/10 | |
2010-05-10 | S. refused to concur in H. am. 1 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-05 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1481) | |
2010-05-05 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-04-26 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-22 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | S. Reset on cal. for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA1252) | |
2010-04-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1218) | |
2010-04-19 | Motion to reconsider S. am. 3 adopted. | |
2010-04-19 | Motion to reconsider adopted. | |
2010-04-19 | Lift from table motion to reconsider. | |
2010-04-15 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 1 | |
2010-04-15 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1206) | |
2010-04-15 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1193) | |
2010-04-15 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1218) | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/12/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 20 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2459 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1118