TN SB2605 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 876
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 876
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that law permits prosecution and conviction for displaying sexual activity to a minor by electronic communication regardless of whether the victim is a minor or an undercover police officer posing as a minor. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that law permits prosecution and conviction for displaying sexual activity to a minor by electronic communication regardless of whether the victim is a minor or an undercover police officer posing as a minor. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 876 | |
2012-04-16 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2856 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 876