TN SB2725 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a violent juvenile sexual offender registry. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, creates a violent juvenile sexual offender registry. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | S. Reset on cal. for 6/2/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/25/2010 | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/17/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/12/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2789 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010