TN SB2725 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Civil Rights Initiative Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Civil Rights Initiative Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Failed in S. S&L Gov. Comm. due to lack of second | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3065 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2725&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2725.pdf |