TN SB2725 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds to the provisions governing confidentiality of photographic evidence that depicts certain deceased persons. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-504, relative to confidential records.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022