TN SB2813 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that one or more members of a local legislative body who meet with one or more members of the state legislative delegation that represent the county or city is not a meeting under the law regarding open meetings for governing bodies, so long as the meeting is an exchange of information and not deliberative in nature or the member or members of the state legislative delegation conduct the meeting to discuss state matters. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 44, relative to public meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2024 | |
2024-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 818 | |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0842) |
2024-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0899) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2373 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 818