TN SB2931 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Transmitted to Gov. for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Transmitted to Gov. for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions of the Uniform Commercial Code. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 1; Title 47, Chapter 2; Title 47, Chapter 2A and Title 47, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions of the Uniform Commercial Code. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 1; Title 47, Chapter 2; Title 47, Chapter 2A and Title 47, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-09-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-08-21 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-08-21 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 708 | |
2012-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/11/12; 07/01/13 | |
2012-04-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-03-27 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-21 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-03-19 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0880) | |
2012-03-19 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-03-19 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-15 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-15 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0846) | |
2012-03-15 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0831) | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3150 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 708