TN SB3762 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the maximum allowable exemption from the inheritance tax incrementally over next three years; eliminates the inheritance tax beginning in 2016. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, increases the maximum allowable exemption from the inheritance tax incrementally over next three years; eliminates the inheritance tax beginning in 2016. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057 | |
2012-04-27 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1320) | |
2012-04-27 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1319) | |
2012-04-27 | Am. 1 tabled | |
2012-04-27 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Ref. to S. F,W&M w/ recommend | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2012-02-02 | P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2012-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-30 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3760 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1057