TN SB3816 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, reduces number of school districts from four to three; increases Lake County board of education from eight members to nine members. - Amends Chapter 119 of the Private Acts of 2002.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, reduces number of school districts from four to three; increases Lake County board of education from eight members to nine members. - Amends Chapter 119 of the Private Acts of 2002.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 77 | |
2012-04-30 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-19 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2012-04-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-04-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3887 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 77