TN SB3901 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, modifies various tax provisions, including provisions governing sales for resale, captive REITS, brownfield property and job tax credits; establishes tax relief in regard to certain flood-damaged property. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 55; Title 56; Title 67 and Title 71, Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007; and Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009.
Title
As enacted, modifies various tax provisions, including provisions governing sales for resale, captive REITS, brownfield property and job tax credits; establishes tax relief in regard to certain flood-damaged property. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 55; Title 56; Title 67 and Title 71, Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007; and Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 13 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1134 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/30/10; 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-10 | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 1 | |
2010-06-10 | Am. No. 2 & 3 reconsidered, withdrawn. | |
2010-06-10 | Motion to reconsider adopted. | |
2010-06-10 | Motion to lift from table adopted. | |
2010-06-09 | Held on desk. | |
2010-06-09 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/09/10 | |
2010-06-09 | S. refused to concur in am. 2 | |
2010-06-09 | S. failed to concur in am. 3, Ayes 11, Nays 20 | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2010 | |
2010-06-05 | S. Reset on next message cal. | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 2 | |
2010-06-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1658) | |
2010-06-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1659) | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1640) | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 4 | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 13 - SA1568) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 12 - SA1558) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 11 - SA1557) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 10 - SA1532) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA1463) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1461) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 9 - SA1517) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 8 - SA1516) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 7 - SA1515) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - SA1513) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1460) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1459) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1456) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 17 of 0 - SA1575) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 16 of 0 - SA1574) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 15 of 0 - SA1573) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 14 of 0 - SA1572) | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11 Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-06-03 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Re-ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/25/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 5/24/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Re-ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-24 | Recalled from S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 3 PNV 0 | |
2010-05-13 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/o recommend | |
2010-05-11 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3787 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1134