TN SJR0442 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Elton Sims, 2008 Milan Chamber of Commerce Man of the Year
Title
Elton Sims, 2008 Milan Chamber of Commerce Man of the Year
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-20 | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-05-18 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/20/09 | |
2009-05-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-18 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 05/18/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-05-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-05-11 | Filed for intro. |