TN SJR1629 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns 113th General Assembly sine die on April 25, 2024.
Title
A RESOLUTION to provide for the adjournment sine die of the One Hundred Thirteenth General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-25 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1629&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SJR1629.pdf |