TX HB100 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a notarized affidavit requesting a municipal animal control authority to manage dangerous dogs and aggressive dogs in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.
Title
Relating to a notarized affidavit requesting a municipal animal control authority to manage dangerous dogs and aggressive dogs in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Amended RV#1070 (Y: 95 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1070 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Hull and Moody |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |