TX HB1004 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an electronic system adopted and maintained by public institutions of higher education to employ a person to track the academic progress of military veterans or their family members receiving student financial assistance.
Title
Relating to an electronic system adopted and maintained by public institutions of higher education to employ a person to track the academic progress of military veterans or their family members receiving student financial assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - HB 1004Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-13 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Military & Veterans
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Military & Veterans