TX HB1024 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded as a prize at a charitable raffle.
Title
Relating to the value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded as a prize at a charitable raffle.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-04-20 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 500 |
2023-04-17 | House | Postponed 4/20/23 10:00 AM |
2023-04-17 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-04-11 | House | Postponed 4/17/23 10:00 AM |
2023-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-16 | House | Filed |