TX HB1161 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of home address information for victims of child abduction and to the administration of the address confidentiality program by the office of the attorney general.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of home address information for victims of child abduction and to the administration of the address confidentiality program by the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. John Lujan [R] |
Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#101 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#101 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-06 | House | Record vote RV#101 |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB461 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB461 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB461 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Protection of Personal Information
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Protection of Personal Information